AB369
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Mortenson

Revises provisions relating to the property tax exemption for the property of certain nonprofit organizations. (BDR 32-916)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 159.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Mar. 24, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Taxation     Apr. 07, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 28, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Taxation     May. 12, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 16   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 18   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.268   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 268.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 16, 2009

Apr 17, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 15, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 18, 2009

May 19, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 159.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.