AB370
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Carpenter

Makes various changes to provisions governing pharmacies. (BDR 54-1014)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 306.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 01, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 21   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 20   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.538     Amend. No.598   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 538.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

Apr 22, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 19, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 598.) To printer.

May 20, 2009

May 21, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 598 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 306.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.