AB372
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Carpenter

Makes various changes concerning registration of commercial motor vehicles. (BDR 43-1015)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 128.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar. 31, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Transportation     Apr. 02, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 28, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     May. 06, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 17   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 12   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 09, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 10, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 13, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 14, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 16, 2009

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2009

Apr 20, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To committee.

May 08, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 11, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 12, 2009

May 13, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 15, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 19, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 128.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.