SB264
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Care

Directs the Legislative Commission to conduct an interim study concerning the powers delegated to local governments and requires the Legislative Commission to appoint an Interim Technical Advisory Committee for Intergovernmental Relations. (BDR S-81)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 462.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar. 25, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr. 03, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and rerefer
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr. 28, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 14, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 21, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 22, 2009     04:38 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     May. 31, 2009     10:45 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 29   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun. 01   Yea 28,   Nay 14,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.214     Amend. No.940   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 17, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 15, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 214.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Apr 16, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

May 28, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 940.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .

May 29, 2009

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To committee.

Jun 01, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 462.
  • Effective July 1, 2009. Section 9 expires by limitation June 30, 2011.