SB267
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Wiener

Makes various changes concerning governmental administration. (BDR 18-62)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 419.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr. 01, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 04, 2009     09:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 11, 2009     09:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 27, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 28, 2009     12:20 PM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 21   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 20   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.656   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 21, 2009

  • Amendment No. 179 withdrawn.
  • Read second time.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Apr 22, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 19, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 656.) To printer.

May 20, 2009

May 21, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 28, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 656 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 29, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 419.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.