SB269
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Carlton , Hardy , Smith

Makes various changes to provisions governing physicians and certain related professions. (BDR 54-757)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 494.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 08, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 04, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 27, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do not concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 21   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May. 22   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    4th Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.422     Amend. No.783     Amend. No.905     Amend. No.CA21   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 17, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 422.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

Apr 22, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 783.) Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. To printer.

May 21, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Chief Clerk's desk.

May 22, 2009

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 905.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.)
  • To printer.

May 23, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

May 28, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 783 and 905 not concurred in. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 783 and 905 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 01, 2009

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment Nos. 783 and 905 and further amend.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint .

Jun 02, 2009

  • To enrollment.

Jun 03, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 494.
  • Sections 27, 78.1 to 78.5, inclusive, 86, 88, 89 and 91 effective June 9, 2009. Sections 1, 2, 13.5, 14, 17, 18, 22, 23, 25, 26, 28, 30, 31, 32, 35 to 38.5, inclusive, 40, 41, 42, 43, 44, 47, 48, 49, 53, 54, 54.5, 57, 58, 66 to 69, inclusive, 70.5, 71 to 74, inclusive, 74.7 to 78, inclusive, 87 and 90 effective June 9, 2009 for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any preliminary administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and October 1, 2009, for all other purposes. Sections 1.7, 3 to 13, inclusive, 15, 16, 19, 20, 21, 24, 29, 33, 39, 45, 46, 50, 51, 52, 55, 59 to 65, inclusive, 70 and 79 to 85, inclusive, effective June 9, 2009 for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any preliminary administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and July 1, 2010, for all other purposes. Sections 1.3, 23.5, 41.5, 42.5, 70.7, 74.5 and 85.5 effective July 1, 2011. Section 33 expires by limitation on the date which the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 666 requiring each state to establish procedures under which the state has authority to withhold or suspend, or to restrict the use of professional, occupational and recreational licenses of persons who: Have failed to comply with a subpoena or warrant relating to a procedure to determine the paternity of a child or to establish or enforce an obligation for the support of a child; or Are in arrears in the payment of the support of one or more children, are repealed by the Congress of the United States. Section 34 effective on the date on which the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 666 requiring each state to establish procedures under which the state has authority to withhold or suspend, or to restrict the use of professional, occupational and recreational licenses of persons who: Have failed to comply with a subpoena or warrant relating to a proceeding to determine the paternity of a child or to establish or enforce an obligation for the support of a child; or Are in arrears in the payment of the support of one or more children, are repealed by the Congress of the United States. Sections 34 and 60 expire by limitation on the date 2 years after the date on which the provision of 42 U.S.C. § 666 requiring each state to establish procedures under which the state has authority to withhold or suspend, or to restrict the use of professional, occupational and recreational licenses of persons who: Have failed to comply with a subpoena or warrant relating to a proceeding to determine the paternity of a child or to establish or enforce an obligation for the support of a child; or Are in arrears in the payment for the support of one or more children, are repealed by the Congress of the United States.