AB378
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Oceguera

Revises provisions governing distributors of intoxicating liquor. (BDR 32-894)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 343.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 03, 2009     12:00 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Taxation     May. 05, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Taxation     May. 12, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Taxation     May. 21, 2009     08:12 PM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 14   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 22   Yea 19,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.679     Amend. No.888   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 14, 2009

Apr 15, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 19, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 679.) To printer.

May 20, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2009

May 23, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment Nos. 679 and 888 concurred in. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 343.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.