SB276
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
McGinness

Makes various changes concerning land sales agreements and compliance with the real property transfer tax. (BDR 32-724)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 266.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Mar. 24, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 02, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Taxation     Apr. 28, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Taxation     May. 07, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Taxation     May. 20, 2009     09:50 PM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 16   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 19   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.215     Amend. No.623   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 17, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 15, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 215.) To printer.

Apr 16, 2009

Apr 17, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 623.) To printer.

May 19, 2009

May 20, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 21, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 623 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 266.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.