SB278
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
McGinness

Requiring the Legislative Committee on Health Care to study certain issues concerning the provision of health care. (BDR S-1061)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 267.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 06, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 08, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May. 06, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May. 12, 2009     07:00 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Education     May. 20, 2009     01:20 PM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 17   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 18   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.298     Amend. No.677   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 16, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 298.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2009

Apr 20, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 15, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 677.) To printer.

May 16, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2009

May 19, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 21, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 677 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 267.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.