SB279
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Care

Makes various changes relating to public records. (BDR 19-82)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr. 06, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr. 08, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amendment proposed, failed

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 17, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)