AB381
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Segerblom , Ohrenschall , Anderson , Mortenson

Revises various provisions relating to arbitration. (BDR 52-931)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Nevada Constitution, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 11, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 14   Yea 29,   Nay 12,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 22   Yea 16,   Nay 5,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Votes in Response to Governor's Veto  (2/3 Majority Required)
   Assembly Override (Not Sustain)    (1st Reprint)       May. 31   Yea 28,   Nay 14,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Override (Not Sustain)    (1st Reprint)       Jun. 01   Yea 10,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 2,   Absent 0

Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.764     Amend. No.915   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 14, 2009

Apr 15, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 19, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 20, 2009

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 764 and 915.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.) To Assembly.

May 23, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment Nos. 764 and 915 concurred in. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2009

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

May 30, 2009

  • Returned to Assembly.

May 31, 2009

Jun 01, 2009

  • Made Special Order of Business for Monday, June 1, 2009, at 7:08 p.m.
  • Bill read. Veto sustained. (Yeas: 10, Nays: 9, Not voting: 2.)
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • (Pursuant to Nevada Constitution, no further action allowed.)