AB386
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Horne

Proposes to exempt sales to senior citizens of hearing aids, hearing aid accessories and ophthalmic or ocular devices or appliances from sales and use taxes and analogous taxes. (BDR 32-525)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Mar. 31, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Taxation     Apr. 07, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 22, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Taxation and Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committees.

Mar 30, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 09, 2009

  • From Concurrent Committee on Taxation: Do pass.
  • To Concurrent Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)