SB284
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Townsend

Exempts certain retired public officers and employees from disqualification for retirement allowances for reemployment with a public employer under the Public Employees' Retirement System. (BDR 23-687)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Apr. 03, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)