AB387
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Conklin , Kirkpatrick , Leslie , Buckley , Oceguera , Bobzien

Makes various changes to provisions concerning energy resources. (BDR 58-223)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 246.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 01, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 06, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     May. 07, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     May. 08, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     May. 12, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     May. 13, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     May. 15, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     May. 16, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 21   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.490     Amend. No.801   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 490.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 19, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 801.) To printer.

May 20, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2009

May 22, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 801 concurred in. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 246.
  • Effective July 1, 2009. Sections 2 and 3 of this act expire by limitation June 30, 2011.