SB285
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Townsend

Provides for a partial abatement from the sales and use tax for services, labor and materials related to aviation. (BDR 32-688)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Feb. 24, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Withdrawn
  Senate Taxation     Mar. 24, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 09, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          Withdrawn

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 17, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)