SB286
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cegavske , Hardy , Lee , Parks , Raggio , Parnell , Settelmeyer

Establishes provisions relating to early intervention services. (BDR 40-637)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 30, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 06, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Apr. 27, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May. 28, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Without recommendation and rerefer
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May. 30, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 29   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.226   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Mar 17, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 226.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 29, 2009

  • From committee: Without recommendation, as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)