AB389
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parnell , Horne , Anderson , Kihuen , Koivisto , Carpenter , Conklin , Dondero Loop , Grady , Gustavson , Hambrick , Manendo , McArthur , Mortenson , Oceguera , Ohrenschall , Segerblom , Amodei

Revises provisions governing the protection of personal identifying information. (BDR 52-772)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 161.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 27, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 28, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May. 02, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 14   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 12   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.147     Amend. No.603   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 147.) To printer.

Apr 14, 2009

Apr 15, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 04, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 05, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 603.) To printer.

May 06, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 08, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 11, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 12, 2009

May 13, 2009

  • In Assembly.

May 16, 2009

  • Senate Amendment No. 603 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 18, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 161.
  • Sections 2, 3 and 4 of this act effective July 1, 2009. Section 1 of this act effective October 1, 2009.