SB287
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Wiener

Makes various changes concerning personal financial administration. (BDR 13-658)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 215.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 24, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 02, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 06, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 13   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 18   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.190   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 17, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 08, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 190.) To printer.

Apr 09, 2009

Apr 13, 2009

Apr 14, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 06, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 08, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 12, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 13, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 15, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2009

May 19, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 20, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 215.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.