AB395
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Aizley , Buckley , Bobzien , Kirkpatrick , Leslie , Pierce , Smith , Parks

Provides for workplace relations discussions and agreements for certain state employees. (BDR 23-1020)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Return to 2011 Session.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 03, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 09, 2009     09:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 29, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Finance     May. 13, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 13, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 14, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Without recommendation and rerefer
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 01   Yea 28,   Nay 14,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 31   Yea 13,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.518     Amend. No.794   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 518.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 01, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate.

May 02, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 15, 2009

  • From committee: Without recommendation and rerefer to the Committee on Government Affairs.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 19, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 20, 2009

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 31, 2009

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 794.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.)
  • To printer.

Jun 01, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 794 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2009

  • Vetoed by the Governor.
  • (Return to 2011 Session.)