AB410
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Claborn

Makes various changes concerning workers' compensation. (BDR 53-90)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 383.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 06, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 08, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 22, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 24, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 14   Yea 30,   Nay 11,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 12   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Votes in Response to Governor's Veto  (2/3 Majority Required)
   Assembly Override (Not Sustain)    (1st Reprint)       May. 31   Yea 28,   Nay 14,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Override (Not Sustain)    (1st Reprint)       May. 31   Yea 18,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.575   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 14, 2009

Apr 15, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 04, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 05, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 575.) To printer.

May 06, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 08, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 11, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 12, 2009

May 13, 2009

  • In Assembly.

May 16, 2009

  • Senate Amendment No. 575 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 18, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 23, 2009

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

May 30, 2009

  • Returned to Assembly.

May 31, 2009

Jun 01, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • Chapter 383.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.