AB413
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Claborn

Enacts the Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote. (BDR 24-822)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 02, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 09, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 07, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 21   Yea 27,   Nay 14,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 13, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 14, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 21, 2009

Apr 22, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)