AB414
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Claborn , Atkinson , Bobzien , Hambrick , Hogan , Leslie , Manendo , McClain , Mortenson , Stewart

Makes various changes to the requirements for emissions inspections of certain vehicles. (BDR 40-821)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 309.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Mar. 23, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Mar. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 08, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 10, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 15, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Rerefer
  Senate Natural Resources     May. 12, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Natural Resources     May. 15, 2009     12:46 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 13   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 19   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 31, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 01, 2009

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Apr 10, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 13, 2009

Apr 14, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To committee.

Apr 15, 2009

  • From committee: Rerefer to Committee on Natural Resources.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 18, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 19, 2009

May 20, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 309.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.