AB422
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Smith , Buckley , Leslie , Anderson , Kirkpatrick , Bobzien , Conklin , Denis , Hardy , Koivisto , Mastroluca , McClain , Oceguera , Parnell

Makes various changes regarding the financing of local improvements with revenue pledged from sales and use taxes. (BDR 21-54)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 02, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 07, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Without recommendation, and rerefer
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 29, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 13, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 27, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Jun. 01, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 22   Yea 39,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.686   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 09, 2009

  • From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 22, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 686.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 3.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)