AB426
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Pierce , Arberry , Atkinson , Hogan , Horne , Kihuen , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Leslie , McClain , Mortenson , Munford , Oceguera , Ohrenschall , Segerblom , Parks , Copening , Wiener

Requires the Division of Environmental Protection of the State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources to conduct a study concerning programs for reusing and recycling computers and other electronics. (BDR S-466)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 344.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Mar. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Apr. 06, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 04, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Natural Resources     May. 19, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 05   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 22   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.220   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 09, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 220.) To printer.

Apr 10, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 05, 2009

May 06, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.

May 20, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 21, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 22, 2009

May 23, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 344.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.