AB430
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Pierce , Koivisto , Arberry , Atkinson , Hogan , Horne , Kihuen , Kirkpatrick , Leslie , McClain , Mortenson , Munford , Oceguera , Ohrenschall , Segerblom , Parks

Prohibits certain activity regarding unsafe cribs and other children's products. (BDR 52-464)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 436.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 08, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 06, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 12, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 16, 2009     11:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 27, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 20   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May. 28   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.440     Amend. No.807     Amend. No.958   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 17, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 440.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 807.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 21, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 28, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 958.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 29, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 958 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 436.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.