AB432
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Smith , Oceguera

Revises provisions governing alcoholic beverage awareness programs. (BDR 32-526)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 132.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Mar. 26, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Taxation     Apr. 09, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Apr. 15, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 27, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May. 02, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 17   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 12   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.414     Amend. No.602   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 414.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2009

Apr 20, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 08, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 11, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 602.) To printer.

May 12, 2009

May 13, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 602 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 15, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 19, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 132.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.