AB436
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Smith , Conklin , Buckley , Oceguera , Gansert , Leslie

Provides for the payment of certain death benefits under industrial insurance under certain circumstances. (BDR 53-1083)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 06, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Without recommendation, and rerefer
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 04, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          Not Heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 17, 2009

  • From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)