AB441
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ohrenschall , Bobzien , Aizley , Buckley , Claborn , Denis , Goedhart , Goicoechea , Hambrick , Hogan , Kihuen , Koivisto , Leslie , Manendo , McClain , Mortenson , Munford , Oceguera , Parnell , Segerblom , Parks

Revises provisions governing transportation. (BDR 43-840)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 109.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar. 31, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Transportation     Apr. 09, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 24, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     May. 06, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     May. 28, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 40,   Nay 1,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 12   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.382   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 17, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 382.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2009

Apr 21, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To committee.

May 08, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 11, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 12, 2009

May 13, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 15, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 19, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 109.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.