AB442
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Kirkpatrick , Segerblom , Conklin , Goicoechea , Munford , Pierce , Smith , Cegavske , Horsford

Revises provisions concerning lobbying. (BDR 31-176)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 02, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 09, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr. 28, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr. 21   Yea 40,   Nay 1,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.545     Amend. No.554   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 545.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

Apr 22, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)