AB444
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Kirkpatrick , Smith

Repeals certain tax abatements and credits granted to certain businesses. (BDR 32-48)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 03, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Withdrawn
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 11, 2009     09:30 AM    Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Government Affairs and Taxation. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committees.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)