AB446
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Buckley

Revises certain requirements for the proposed budget of the Executive Department of the State Government. (BDR 31-581)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Nevada Constitution, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar. 23, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 22, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May. 13, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May. 20, 2009     04:00 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 02   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 20   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Votes in Response to Governor's Veto  (2/3 Majority Required)
   Assembly Override (Not Sustain)    (1st Reprint)       May. 31   Yea 34,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Override (Not Sustain)    (1st Reprint)       Jun. 01   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.569   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Apr 29, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 01, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 569.) To printer.

May 02, 2009

May 04, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs.
  • Action of referral rescinded.
  • Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 20, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 21, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

May 30, 2009

  • Returned to Assembly.

May 31, 2009

Jun 01, 2009

  • Made Special Order of Business for Monday, June 1, 2009, at 2:20 p.m.
  • Bill read. Veto sustained. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.)
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • (Pursuant to Nevada Constitution, no further action allowed.)