AB448
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Bobzien , Conklin , Leslie , Parks

Revises provisions governing incentive programs for renewable energy. (BDR 58-511)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 01, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 29, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 29, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May. 12, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.441   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 441.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective.
  • To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)