AB450
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Gustavson , Cobb , Goicoechea , Hambrick , McArthur

Repeals the business excise tax. (BDR 32-953)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Apr. 07, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Withdrawn

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)