AB451
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Arberry

Establishes a program for the investment of state money in certificates of deposit at a reduced rate to provide lending institutions with money for reduced-rate loans to certain small businesses in this State. (BDR 31-613)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Return to 2011 Session.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 08, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 09, 2009     09:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 19, 2009     09:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 27, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 21   Yea 37,   Nay 3,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       Jun. 01   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.347     Amend. No.886     Amend. No.990   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 347.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 22, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.

May 21, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 886.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 3, Excused: 2.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 31, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 990.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Jun 01, 2009

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 990 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2009

  • Vetoed by the Governor.
  • (Return to 2011 Session.)