AB455
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Woodbury , Hardy , Aizley , Atkinson , Carpenter , Christensen , Claborn , Cobb , Denis , Gansert , Goedhart , Goicoechea , Grady , Hambrick , Manendo , Spiegel , Stewart , Cegavske

Provides for self-registration of certain motor vehicles. (BDR 43-877)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 107.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar. 31, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Transportation     Apr. 09, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 24, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     May. 06, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 17   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 12   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 13, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 17, 2009

Apr 20, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To committee.

May 08, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 11, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 12, 2009

May 13, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 15, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 19, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 107.
  • Effective January 1, 2010.