SB288
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Carlton , Conklin

Revises provisions relating to occupational safety and health. (BDR 53-163)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 216.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 17, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 29, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 13, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 21   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 18   Yea 34,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.527   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 26, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Apr 14, 2009

  • Waiver granted effective: April 10, 2009.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 527.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Apr 22, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 18, 2009

May 19, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 20, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 216.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.