AB458
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Buckley , Smith , Parnell , Kirkpatrick

Revises various provisions relating to funding for public education. (BDR 31-685)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Nevada Constitution, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 06, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May. 13, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Senate Finance     May. 19, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Finance     May. 20, 2009     04:00 PM    Minutes          Do pass   Rescind previous action on: 5-20-09   Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May. 21, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 12   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 21   Yea 12,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 1

Votes in Response to Governor's Veto  (2/3 Majority Required)
   Assembly Override (Not Sustain)    (2nd Reprint)       May. 30   Yea 36,   Nay 5,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Override (Not Sustain)    (2nd Reprint)       Jun. 01   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.619     Amend. No.883   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

May 12, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 619.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.

May 13, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.

May 15, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

May 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 883.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .

May 21, 2009

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

May 30, 2009

Jun 01, 2009

  • Made Special Order of Business for Monday, June 1, 2009, at 9:00 p.m.
  • Bill read. Veto sustained. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.)
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • (Pursuant to Nevada Constitution, no further action allowed.)