SB292
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Care

Adopts the Uniform Representation of Children in Abuse, Neglect, and Custody Proceedings Act. (BDR 38-1025)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 06, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 08, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 21   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 14, 2009

  • Read second time.

Apr 15, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 16, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 21, 2009

Apr 22, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)