SB294
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Lee

Authorizes certain requests for legislation and requires an interim study regarding the distribution of taxes among local governmental entities in this State. (BDR 32-1029)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Mar. 31, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 07, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 09, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr. 28, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 14, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 16   Yea 18,   Nay 1,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.416   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 17, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 16, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 416.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Apr 17, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

May 15, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

May 16, 2009

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 1, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)