SB299
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Nolan

Provides for the reimbursement of certain costs to Legislators under certain circumstances. (BDR 17-561)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar. 24, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 14, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     May. 21, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 19   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.755   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 17, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 18, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 755.) To printer.

May 19, 2009

May 20, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To committee.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)