SB307
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Wiener , Horsford , Woodhouse , Cegavske , Parks , Amodei , Copening , Hardy , Lee , McGinness , Nolan , Schneider , Washington

Requires the Office of the Director of the Department of Health and Human Services to study issues relating to Medicaid. (BDR S-241)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 88.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 23, 2009     03:15 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 24, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr. 20, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May. 04, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 13   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 06   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 25, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 26, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 30, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 01, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 08, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 13, 2009

Apr 14, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 05, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 06, 2009

May 08, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 13, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 18, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 88.
  • Effective May 18, 2009, for the purposes of accepting money pursuant to subsection 2 of section 1 and on July 1, 2009, for all other purposes.