SB312
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Mathews

Revises provisions governing the verification of motor vehicle liability insurance policies by the Department of Motor Vehicles. (BDR 43-286)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 396.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Mar. 24, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 10, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 22, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Transportation     Apr. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 13, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 15, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     May. 23, 2009     12:03 PM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 17   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 19   Yea 40,   Nay 1,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.486     Amend. No.800   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 14, 2009

  • Read second time.

Apr 15, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 16, 2009

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 486.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2009

Apr 20, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 01, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 02, 2009

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 12, 2009

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 800.) To printer.

May 19, 2009

May 20, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 26, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 800 concurred in. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 396.
  • Effective June 1, 2009 for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and February 1, 2010, for all other purposes.