SB314
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Mathews , Amodei , Horsford , Lee , Townsend , Wiener , Hardy , Anderson , Carpenter , Grady , Ohrenschall

Adopts the Uniform Power of Attorney Act. (BDR 13-183)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 64.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 27, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 02, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 29, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 15   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 02   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.189   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 08, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 13, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 189.) To printer.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2009

Apr 16, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 29, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 01, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 02, 2009

May 04, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 05, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 11, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 64.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.