SB315
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Raggio , Cegavske , Nolan , Washington , Townsend , Hardy , McGinness

Revises certain provisions concerning voter identification. (BDR 24-925)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar. 26, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr. 09, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)