SB316
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Copening , Parks , Woodhouse , Wiener , Carlton , Segerblom

Directs the Legislative Committee on Health Care to consider the establishment of a health insurance exchange in Nevada. (BDR S-1108)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 496.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar. 26, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 30, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May. 31, 2009     02:00 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 30   Yea 16,   Nay 5,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun. 01   Yea 35,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.985   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 17, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

May 30, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 985.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Jun 01, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 7.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 496.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.