SB317
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Copening , Parks , Woodhouse , Wiener , Carlton , Segerblom

Requires instruction on financial literacy in the public high schools. (BDR 34-1109)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 268.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 27, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     May. 04, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Education     May. 20, 2009     02:15 PM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 13   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 18   Yea 40,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.142     Amend. No.605   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Mar 17, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 02, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 142.) To printer.

Apr 07, 2009

Apr 08, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 13, 2009

Apr 14, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 06, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 605.) To printer.

May 07, 2009

May 08, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 12, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 13, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 15, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2009

May 19, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 21, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 605 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 268.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.