AB462
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ohrenschall , Segerblom

Revises the provisions governing sureties. (BDR 14-838)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 70.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 01, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 03, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 09, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 22, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 29, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     May. 12, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 13   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 01   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 10, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 13, 2009

Apr 14, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 29, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 30, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 01, 2009

May 02, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 05, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 11, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 70.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.