SB322
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks

Provides for the establishment and maintenance of an integrated system for the provision of health and social services in certain counties. (BDR 40-1073)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 06, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 08, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Mar 17, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)