AB467
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Pierce , Claborn , Koivisto , Manendo , Segerblom

Makes various changes relating to the prevailing wage requirements. (BDR 28-910)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 385.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar. 31, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Rescheduled
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 01, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 09, 2009     09:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 06, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 13, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 21   Yea 27,   Nay 14,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 21   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0

Votes in Response to Governor's Veto  (2/3 Majority Required)
   Senate Override (Not Sustain)    (2nd Reprint)       May. 31   Yea 18,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
   Assembly Override (Not Sustain)    (2nd Reprint)       May. 31   Yea 28,   Nay 14,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.349     Amend. No.838   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 349.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 14, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.

Apr 22, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 19, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 20, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 838.) To printer.

May 21, 2009

May 22, 2009

  • In Assembly.

May 23, 2009

  • Senate Amendment No. 838 concurred in. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2009

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

May 30, 2009

  • Returned to Assembly.

May 31, 2009

Jun 01, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • Chapter 385.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.