AB470
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Anderson

Prohibits noncompete agreements with certain employees. (BDR 53-1021)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 06, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 06, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 26,   Nay 15,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.525   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 525.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 15, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)